OK HB2702 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing penalty for dumping furniture or items of certain weight; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing penalty for dumping furniture or items of certain weight; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |