OK HB2697 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying headlamp use requirement; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying headlamp use requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Motion expired |
2016-03-10 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Enns |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 60 |
2016-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2016-03-10 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2016-03-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |