OK HB2696 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; making certain educational requirements optional for certain school board members; effective date.
Title
Schools; making certain educational requirements optional for certain school board members; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Johnson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |