OK HB2690 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Tax Credit Reauthorization Act; definition; sunset period; economic analysis; Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; multiplier; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Tax Credit Reauthorization Act; definition; sunset period; economic analysis; Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; multiplier; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |