OK HB2689 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; making students who are dependents of certain military personnel eligible for in-state residency status; effective date; emergency.
Title
Higher education; making students who are dependents of certain military personnel eligible for in-state residency status; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2012 | |
2012-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-17 | To Senate | |
2012-05-17 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Inman, Sherrer | |
2012-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-15 | Title restored | |
2012-05-15 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-01 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education | |
2012-04-24 | SA's received | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Dorman | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Roan, Hoskin, Walker | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Pittman | |
2012-03-01 | Remove Representative Banz as principal House author and substitute with Representative Joyner | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Banz | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |