OK HB2668 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Medicaid; expanding scope of authority of the Office of Attorney General; fraud investigation; providing that records are confidential; effective date.
Title
Medicaid; expanding scope of authority of the Office of Attorney General; fraud investigation; providing that records are confidential; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Derby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |