OK HB2667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2667
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; taxable income; itemized deductions allowable.
Title
Revenue and taxation; taxable income; itemized deductions allowable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 16 |
2019-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Loring |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-21 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2667 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA