OK HB2653 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Municipal finance; creating the Task Force on Municipal Finance. Emergency.
Title
Municipal finance; creating the Task Force on Municipal Finance. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-12 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure sent to House | |
2010-04-08 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-05 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Aldridge | |
2010-04-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4 | |
2010-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9; Ayes: 54 Nays: 38 | |
2010-03-09 | Title restored | |
2010-03-09 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |