OK HB2652 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; relating to the Oklahoma Refinery Revitalization Act; replacing certain review board with Secretary of Energy and Environment; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; relating to the Oklahoma Refinery Revitalization Act; replacing certain review board with Secretary of Energy and Environment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 13 |
2014-02-24 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |