OK HB2648 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Children; relating to the jurisdiction in certain child custody cases; relating to adoption-related expenses and requirements; providing for the selection of an attorney for birth mothers in some circumstances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; relating to the jurisdiction in certain child custody cases; relating to adoption-related expenses and requirements; providing for the selection of an attorney for birth mothers in some circumstances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-05-19 Further conference granted, same conferees
2010-05-17 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
2010-05-12 Enacting clause restored
2010-05-12 Title restored
2010-05-12 CCR submitted
2010-04-27 HC's named: Nelson, Peterson, Rousselot, Ortega, McDaniel (Jeannie)
2010-04-19 Conference granted, SCs named Russell, Anderson, Crain, Newberry, Laster
2010-04-15 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-13 SA's received
2010-04-13 Engrossed to House
2010-04-12 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-12 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2010-04-12 General Order, Considered
2010-03-25 coauthored by Kern
2010-03-25 Enacting clause stricken
2010-03-25 Title stricken
2010-03-25 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2010-03-23 Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR
2010-03-16 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Kern
2010-03-15 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2010-03-09 First Reading
2010-03-09 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-08 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
2010-03-08 Authored by Senator Russell (principal Senate author)
2010-03-08 General Order
2010-02-23 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Human Services
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Nelson
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1075011New CodeSee Bill Text
1075021New CodeSee Bill Text
1075053New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback