OK HB2643 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to the Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act; modifying provisions related to allocation of tax credits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to the Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act; modifying provisions related to allocation of tax credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-05-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Halligan |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Halligan; authored by Newberry |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |