OK HB2640 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; direct wine shipper's permit; reports; prohibiting shipment of wine to consumers without a permit; penalties; inspection and auditing of records; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; direct wine shipper's permit; reports; prohibiting shipment of wine to consumers without a permit; penalties; inspection and auditing of records; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2640 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Title stricken