OK HB2638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; step therapy reform; providing guidelines; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; step therapy reform; providing guidelines; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Rosino
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Young
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Smalley
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Sneed, Perryman, Hill, Humphrey, Lawson
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2019-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Roberts (Dustin), Blancett
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from Insurance Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Munson, Echols, Bush, Fetgatter, Frix, Wallace, Kannady, Dunnington, Dollens, McEntire, Mize, Bennett, Caldwell (Trey)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback