OK HB2631 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring reserve peace officers to obtain certain amount of continuing law enforcement training. Effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring reserve peace officers to obtain certain amount of continuing law enforcement training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Wallace Collins [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-05 | To Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-05 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-03 | Title restored | |
2010-05-03 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Johnson, Collins, Hoskin, McCullough, Osborn, Ritze, Roan, Tibbs | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-22 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-16 | First Reading | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 | |
2010-02-15 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Collins, Roan, Ritze, McAffrey | |
2010-02-15 | General Order | |
2010-02-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Johnson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |