OK HB2628 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; modifying when fireworks can be sold by certain types of businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; modifying when fireworks can be sold by certain types of businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-05-13 Further conference granted, same conferees
2010-05-11 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
2010-05-04 CCR submitted
2010-04-27 HC's named: Jones, DeWitt, Armes, Thomsen, Scott, Dorman
2010-04-19 Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Sykes, Halligan, Johnson (Mike), Ballenger
2010-04-15 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-07 SA's received
2010-04-07 Engrossed to House
2010-04-06 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-06 Motion expired
2010-03-30 Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley
2010-03-30 Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12
2010-03-30 Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12
2010-03-30 coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2010-03-30 General Order, Considered
2010-03-17 coauthored by Shelton
2010-03-17 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed
2010-03-16 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR
2010-03-16 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Shelton
2010-03-08 Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security
2010-03-02 First Reading
2010-03-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-01 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-01 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2010-03-01 Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author)
2010-03-01 Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox
2010-03-01 General Order
2010-02-23 CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Jones
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
681623New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback