OK HB2623 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Remove Representative Peterson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blackwell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Electromagnetic shield protection; requiring electric providers to install certain technology on critical infrastructure and facilities; ballot title; directing filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electromagnetic shield protection; requiring electric providers to install certain technology on critical infrastructure and facilities; ballot title; directing filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - House of Representatives - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27HouseRemove Representative Peterson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blackwell
2014-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
2014-02-24HouseReferred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
2014-02-24HouseWithdrawn from States' Rights Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to States' Rights
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Peterson
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback