OK HB2598 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Finance Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; allowing licensed wrecker operators to take possession of impounded vehicle tags; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; allowing licensed wrecker operators to take possession of impounded vehicle tags; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Finance Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback