OK HB2594 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing alternate form of payment for handgun license applications and renewals; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing alternate form of payment for handgun license applications and renewals; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Government Modernization committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Government Modernization committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 04/07/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | General Order |
2014-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |