OK HB2593 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; relating to the State Dental Act; modifying permit to operate a dental laboratory. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; relating to the State Dental Act; modifying permit to operate a dental laboratory. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | coauthored by Ritze | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-16 | First Reading | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-15 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |