OK HB2571 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Oklahoma Missing in America Act. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Oklahoma Missing in America Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Rep. Danny Morgan [D] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-15 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Walker, Luttrell, Morgan | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-29 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker, Luttrell | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-08 | Authored by Senator Russell (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Brown | |
2010-02-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-03 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Wesselhoft, Billy, McAffrey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |