OK HB2566 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; freedom of choice for residents of assisted living centers; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; freedom of choice for residents of assisted living centers; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Long-Term Care & Senior Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-02 Sent to Governor
2012-05-02 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-02 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-01 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-01 Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11
2012-05-01 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan
2012-05-01 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-19 SA's received
2012-04-19 Engrossed to House
2012-04-18 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2012-04-18 coauthored by Pittman, Cox
2012-04-18 coauthored by Fields
2012-04-18 General Order, Amended
2012-04-09 coauthored by Eason McIntyre, Garrison, McAffrey
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2012-03-27 Referred to Rules
2012-03-27 Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2012-03-08 Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2012-02-14 First Reading
2012-02-14 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-02-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-02-13 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
2012-02-13 Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Derby, Russ, Kern, Walker
2012-02-13 General Order
2012-02-07 Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author)
2012-02-07 CR; Do Pass Long Term Care and Senior Services Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Long Term Care and Senior Services
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Wright
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631890New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback