OK HB2551 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; relating to registered emergency medical responders; providing death benefit; modifying name of revolving fund; providing an income tax exemption. Effective dates. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; relating to registered emergency medical responders; providing death benefit; modifying name of revolving fund; providing an income tax exemption. Effective dates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2010-04-07 | Title restored | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2010-03-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Roan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2358 | New Code | See Bill Text |