OK HB2548 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring certain subject area competency examinations to be offered in the native language of the teacher under certain circumstances; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring certain subject area competency examinations to be offered in the native language of the teacher under certain circumstances; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Rep. Ken Walker [R] | Rep. Katie Henke [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Henke |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Walker |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |