OK HB2536 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; permitting parent or guardian to execute power of attorney to delegate care and custody powers to another person; emergency.
Title
Children; permitting parent or guardian to execute power of attorney to delegate care and custody powers to another person; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Ownbey, Pittman, Nollan, Sherrer |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |