OK HB2526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Domestic violence; directing peace officers to make certain assessment; effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; directing peace officers to make certain assessment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-27 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |