OK HB2519 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Nollan
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Nollan
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child pornography; modifying definitions; effective date.
Title
Child pornography; modifying definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Nollan | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Tibbs | |
2012-02-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson, Cox | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1024 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 151 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |