OK HB2517 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2517
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - Remove Senator Rader as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Gollihare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - Remove Senator Rader as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Gollihare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisoner reentry; creating the Oklahoma Prisoner Reentry Pilot Program; stating purpose of pilot program; codification; effective date.
Title
Prisoner reentry; creating the Oklahoma Prisoner Reentry Pilot Program; stating purpose of pilot program; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Remove Senator Rader as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Gollihare |
2023-05-26 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-25 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Rader, Jech, Coleman, Dugger, Pederson, Stephens, Brooks |
2023-05-17 | House | Naming of conferees rescinded |
2023-05-15 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-05-10 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2023-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 7 |
2023-03-23 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-23 | House | Amended |
2023-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-23 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2517 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Remove Senator Rader as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Gollihare