OK HB2517 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Labor; consolidating certain revolving funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Department of Labor; consolidating certain revolving funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-28 | Title restored | |
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 15 | |
2010-02-04 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 141 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 141 | 19a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3024 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 3025 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 63 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |