OK HB2514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; expanding training requirements to staff of hospice agencies; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; expanding training requirements to staff of hospice agencies; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 23 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Munson |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |