OK HB2509 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; aerospace engineers; tax credits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; aerospace engineers; tax credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 04/09/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Jolley, Brinkley |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sears |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2357 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 304 | New Code | See Bill Text |