OK HB2503 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; removing reference to certain commission; repealer; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; removing reference to certain commission; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-02 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 301 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 303 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 304 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 305 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 306 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 308 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 312 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 314 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 315 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 316 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3601 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 500 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |