OK HB2502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit for certain classroom teachers; eligible items; teacher certification fees; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit for certain classroom teachers; eligible items; teacher certification fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sanders |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2502 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Finance