OK HB2502 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying terms of Board members.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; modifying terms of Board members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 38 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 38 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-28 | First Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 27; Ayes: 38 Nays: 50 | |
2012-02-27 | Amended | |
2012-02-27 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Emergency added | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Watson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |