OK HB2485 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Board of Medicolegal Investigations; making an appropriation; modifying budgetary limits. Emergency.
Title
Board of Medicolegal Investigations; making an appropriation; modifying budgetary limits. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] |
Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-03-29 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-03-29 | To Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2010-03-29 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-03-25 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-03-25 | Title restored | |
2010-03-25 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-03-25 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to GCCA | |
2010-03-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-03-18 | SA's received | |
2010-03-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-17 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-17 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-17 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 15 | |
2010-02-04 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |