OK HB2470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; flexible benefit allowance; increasing amount of compensation for certified personnel who do not participate in the health care plan; effective date.
Title
Teachers; flexible benefit allowance; increasing amount of compensation for certified personnel who do not participate in the health care plan; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Hasenbeck |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee assignment Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee removed |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2470 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee