OK HB2463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2463
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology Program Modernization Act; modifying powers and duties; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology Program Modernization Act; modifying powers and duties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Paxton; authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2463 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023