OK HB2462 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; creating the Oklahoma Student Loan Public University Competition Act; effective date.
Title
Higher education; creating the Oklahoma Student Loan Public University Competition Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and CareerTech Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 25 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and CareerTech Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and CareerTech |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Turner |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 694 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 694 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |