OK HB2447 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; adding exclusive provider benefit plan to various provisions; effective date.
Title
Insurance; adding exclusive provider benefit plan to various provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 37 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 37 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 35 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 37 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 35 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Laid over | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 35 Nays: 38 | |
2012-05-25 | Motion to table SAs failed | |
2012-05-25 | Considered | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | |
2012-04-24 | coauthored by Allen | |
2012-04-24 | Title restored | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 27 | |
2012-03-06 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-06 | Amended | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-27 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-27 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Quinn | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1219 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6057 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |