OK HB2446 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; providing for professional employer organization late-registration fee; effective date.
Title
Labor; providing for professional employer organization late-registration fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Approved by Governor 05/14/2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 | |
2012-05-07 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17 | |
2012-03-06 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 11 | |
2012-03-05 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Quinn | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 40 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Laid over | |
2012-02-23 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Quinn | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 600 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 600 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 600 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |