OK HB2434 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Transportation finance; relating to authorizing issuance of certain obligations by the Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; modifying net proceeds. Emergency.
Title
Transportation finance; relating to authorizing issuance of certain obligations by the Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; modifying net proceeds. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 54 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 7 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 54 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 7 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-25 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-25 | Ayes: 59 Nays: 8 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-04-05 | SA's received | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-31 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 | |
2010-02-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |