OK HB2430 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Human Services Disbursing Fund; abolishing fund; transferring revenue; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services Disbursing Fund; abolishing fund; transferring revenue; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseMotion expired
2019-03-14HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 48
2019-03-14HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-14HouseAmended
2019-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
2019-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseEmergency added
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback