OK HB2416 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; State Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; State Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 47 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Fry, Treat, Sykes, Holt, Floyd, Sparks |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2016-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Griffin |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23; Ayes: 47 Nays: 33 |
2016-02-16 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 92 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15d | New Code | See Bill Text |