OK HB2414 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; additional tax levy upon cigarettes; imposing tax on gasoline and diesel fuel for certain period; gross production tax; modifying rate for well spudded after a certain date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; additional tax levy upon cigarettes; imposing tax on gasoline and diesel fuel for certain period; gross production tax; modifying rate for well spudded after a certain date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-18 | House | Motion expired |
2017-05-16 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-05-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 46 |
2017-05-16 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-16 | House | General Order |
2017-05-16 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-16 | House | Joint Rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-05-08 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-05-08 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-05-08 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2414 (Carry Over) 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 302 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7c | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7d | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7e | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7f | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 302 | 7g | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 500 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 500 | 4B | Amended Code | See Bill Text |