OK HB2366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2366
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts: modifying Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals judicial districts; effective date.
Title
Courts: modifying Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals judicial districts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 13 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 26 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2366 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019