OK HB2364 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Banking; transfer of funds to heirs of deceased; modifying affidavit of heirship contents; effective date.
Title
Banking; transfer of funds to heirs of deceased; modifying affidavit of heirship contents; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House: Judiciary committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Glenn |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |