OK HB2355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2355
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle sales; definition; adjustment to exemption from sales tax on motor vehicle sales; excise tax on certain vehicles in lieu of sales and use taxes.
Title
Motor vehicle sales; definition; adjustment to exemption from sales tax on motor vehicle sales; excise tax on certain vehicles in lieu of sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2355 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree