OK HB2350 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2350
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; eliminating exemptions for tickets to certain types of professional athletic and sporting events; effective date; emergency.
Title
Sales tax; eliminating exemptions for tickets to certain types of professional athletic and sporting events; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-18 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | Emergency added |
2017-04-17 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-11 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-11 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-11 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2350 (Carry Over) 2017-04-19 - Direct to Calendar