OK HB2348 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; relating to manufacturing beer; providing permit for manufacture of beer for personal use; prohibiting sale.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; relating to manufacturing beer; providing permit for manufacture of beer for personal use; prohibiting sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20; Ayes: 58 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19 | |
2010-03-03 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-03 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams, Dorman | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-03 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Schwartz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 520A | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 554 | New Code | See Bill Text |