OK HB2345 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Agriculture; creating the Oklahoma Livestock Care Standards Board. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; creating the Oklahoma Livestock Care Standards Board. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-04-27 HC's named: Richardson, DeWitt, Armes, Fields, Renegar, Kouplen, Wright (Harold)
2010-04-19 Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Schulz, Barrington, Garrison
2010-04-15 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-12 SA's received
2010-04-12 Engrossed to House
2010-04-08 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-08 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2010-04-08 coauthored by Walker
2010-04-08 General Order, Considered
2010-03-24 coauthored by Ivester
2010-03-24 Title stricken
2010-03-24 Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2010-03-24 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker
2010-03-23 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ivester
2010-03-23 Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR
2010-03-15 Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2010-03-10 First Reading
2010-03-10 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-09 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-09 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 7
2010-03-09 Amended by floor substitute
2010-03-09 Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author)
2010-03-09 Coauthored by Representative(s) DeWitt
2010-03-09 General Order
2010-02-17 Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields
2010-02-17 CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Richardson
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback