OK HB2341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physical therapy; broadening practitioners who may make referrals; updating statutory terms; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical therapy; broadening practitioners who may make referrals; updating statutory terms; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-05-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
2019-05-21HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2341&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2341%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2341%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2341%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2341%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2341%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2341%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2341%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2341%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2341_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2341_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback